Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1131697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £656.11k £673.11k £649.47k £534.12k £555.96k
Total expenditure £594.84k £662.34k £657.60k £561.26k £513.28k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £6.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £587.11k £594.24k £585.21k £511.68k £504.69k
Income - Other trading activities £56.11k £54.84k £55.04k £15.96k £29.94k
Income - Charitable activities £8.56k £8.62k £6.14k £4.10k £2.83k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.34k £15.41k £3.07k £2.37k £1.12k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £17.38k
Income - Legacies £1.64k £0 £0 £10.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £595.84k £662.34k £657.60k £561.26k £513.28k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.65k £4.92k £5.16k £5.20k £5.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £90.81k £117.68k £130.79k £95.70k £72.20k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0