THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1131697
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN LOWE Trustee 01 May 2016 None on record
Sandra Thompson Trustee 10 September 2020 None on record
ELIZABETH MARRIOTT Trustee 28 March 2019 None on record
PHILIP JOHN HABERSHON Trustee None on record
George Tsafandakis Trustee 25 March 2021 None on record
Rachel Laanest Trustee 10 September 2020 None on record
JOANNA FISHER Trustee 28 March 2019 None on record
LESLEY JANE KEMPSFORD Trustee None on record
JULIE MARIA MCKINLAY Trustee 25 March 2021
FLEETVILLE COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP Received: 2 days late
NICHOLAS SALISBURY Trustee 27 September 2013
ST PAUL'S CHURCH TRUST Received: On time
THE SCOPS ARTS TRUST Received: On time
Rev Peter George Crumpler Trustee 25 March 2021 None on record
LUCY JANE GINTY Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Luke Fletcher Trustee 29 September 2020 None on record
Rev ANDRE RADMALL Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
Justyn David Evans Trustee 10 September 2020 None on record
Nigel Stuart Kingsman Trustee 10 September 2020 None on record
AL LINES Trustee 28 November 2012
WINDSOR A CAPPELLA Received: On time
LINDSEY AUDREY MCLEOD Trustee
ST PAUL'S CHURCH TRUST Received: On time
Eleanor Cook Trustee 25 March 2021 None on record