Financial history WAZANIA ACADEMY

Charity number: 1134484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.90k £5.70k £2.47k £2.19k £923
Total expenditure £11.88k £6.86k £2.57k £1.55k £1.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A