Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WALTHAMSTOW

Charity number: 1132391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £436.66k £545.04k £385.30k £302.55k £421.10k
Total expenditure £532.14k £500.08k £443.07k £400.42k £488.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £101.79k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £460.20k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £82.41k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £2.44k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £400 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £500.08k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £33.23k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A