Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH THE QUINTON, BIRMINGHAM.

Charity number: 1131382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev RACHEL JANE HEATHFIELD Chair 01 September 2016
None on record
Sharron Jane Brice Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
David Homer Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Tracey Straker Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Julie Reid Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Neil Allen Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Emily West Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Mark Heritage Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Joyce Gilkes Trustee 23 May 2019
None on record
Sarah Coton Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Pearl Coton Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Elaine Lewis Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
PETER SHERWEN Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
JO JENNINGS Trustee 02 April 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, HARBORNE
Received: On time
DOREEN LESLEY MORRIS BSC Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
Lisa Ann Moody Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
HEATHER lESLEY WILLIAMS Trustee 04 February 2017
None on record
ANDREW PETER WELLS Trustee 01 July 2015
None on record
John Griffith Trevor Trustee 25 April 2013
None on record
CHRIS ILES Trustee
None on record