THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE, SCALBY

Charity number: 1131317
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HILARY SUSAN TRUEFITT Trustee 18 October 2020
FRIENDS OF ST. LAURENCE'S SCALBY Charity reporting is up to date
THE CHARITY OF CHRISTOPHER KELD Charity reporting is up to date
THE YORK DIOCESAN MINISTERS' RELIEF (2009) FUND Charity reporting is up to date
MARIE ELIZABETH FREEMAN Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
HILARY WALLACE Trustee 17 April 2016 None on record
THOMAS GORDON HILL Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Joan Eileen FENNELL Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
LESLEY ELIZABETH NEWTON Trustee 18 October 2020
NEWBY AND SCALBY LIBRARY AND INFORMATION CENTRE Charity reporting is up to date
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH GRIMMETT Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
SARAH ANN MCINTYRE Trustee 02 July 2012
HAROLD AND LILIAN NEEDHAM TRUST FUND Charity reporting is up to date
KATE HARGRAVE LONG CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
SCALBY,NEWBY AND BURNISTON COAL CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
SARAH KNOWSLEY'S BREAD CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
JOHN JAMES CHARITY Charity reporting is up to date
Rev Michael Anthony HAND Chair 18 October 2020 None on record
Dr Naomi Mehta Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Tracy Anne SQUIRE Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
Dr Benjamin Bryan CLAYBROOK Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
VALERIE ASTON Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
JOAN ELIZABETH ROSE MARTIN Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record