Accounts and annual returns THE STROKE CLUB AND BEFRIENDING SERVICE

Charity number: 1137796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required