Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EMMANUEL, SOUTH CROYDON
Charity number: 1132879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Philip Griffin | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Ian Sinclair | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Woolley | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jonathan Featherstone MA | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Chrystie | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DUMYTRU PAUNELOVYCH HORDA | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Gillam MA FCA | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SIMON SMITH | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Clare Mary Jeffries | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Julie Heath | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Buchanan | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Frederick Adams | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL ORAZULUME | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alastair John Samuel Roseweir | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susanne French | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Smith | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Eleanor Warren | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Martin Waddell | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Graham Burt | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Jonathan David Beresford Mash | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
LINDA ANN PENN | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jan Wilson | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Pickering BA | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY ANN ELIZABETH KNIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD PAUL MASH BSC CERTED | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.