Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, PADDINGTON

Charity number: 1131696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.16m £2.56m £1.84m £307.60k £315.30k
Total expenditure £1.81m £2.73m £1.60m £365.86k £655.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £569.91k £439.81k £419.00k £28.84k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.15m £2.56m £1.83m N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £16.36k £4.50k £7.68k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £840 £871 £925 N/A N/A
Income - Other £1.56k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.81m £2.66m £1.56m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £63.61k £33.69k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £5.40k £5.40k £5.58k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £5.40k £5.58k N/A N/A