Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST MARY, STOWMARKET

Charity number: 1132857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £201.17k £204.53k £261.36k £282.33k £80.78k
Total expenditure £248.22k £206.52k £188.25k £206.14k £112.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £47.11k £44.68k £60.80k £69.51k £59.78k