Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY SPRING GROVE
Charity number: 1132866
Charity reporting is up to date (149 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Elis Matthews | Chair | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Diana Nortey | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Sobyran | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keeley Jo Quartley | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Collis | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE BELLIS | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Philip Toye Mr | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sally Martin-Brown | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW KERRISON BELLIS | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Frederick Collis MBE | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Munn | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE SLOLEY | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHARRION LLEWELLYN | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Denise Toye | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET LILIAN MARY CAVE | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CARL BRYCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HENRY BLAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA CAROLINE GREEN MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA JOYCE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.