Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETERS, NEWTON IN MAKERFIELD
Charity number: 1133794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev James Robert Taylor | Chair | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Caroline Louise Duffy | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Howard Leslie Cooper | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Frances Johnson | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin Jane Halliwell | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Hutton | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Cunliffe Mrs | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Glenn David Hutton | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carol Wendy Jones | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Brammeier | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM EDWARD IRVING | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Lisa Whittaker | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Black Robb | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Annie Houghton | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||
ELAINE GEORGINA FAIRHURST BA HONORS | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS Leanne Burgess | Trustee | 27 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ARCHIBALD | Trustee | 27 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH ANNE LIVESEY | Trustee | 13 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN CAMPBELL HENRY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.