THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, HARTFORD, CHESTER DIOCESE

Charity number: 1134217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £588.08k £508.31k £596.59k £576.58k £535.28k
Total expenditure £432.92k £465.70k £592.99k £506.80k £511.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £20.38k £2.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £504.12k £441.22k £528.00k £472.36k £446.78k
Income - Other trading activities £22.01k £0 £43.67k £17.03k £0
Income - Charitable activities £59.07k £65.12k £24.64k £67.89k £85.63k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £310 £344 £276 £411 £523
Income - Other £2.57k £1.63k £0 £18.89k £2.34k
Income - Legacies £0 £1.30k £0 £20.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £268.39k £460.40k £583.59k £506.70k £501.93k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £5.29k £7.76k £105 £9.18k
Expenditure - Governance £142.54k £152.84k £3.06k £2.78k £2.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution £49.37k £47.04k £83.98k £53.38k £74.66k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £1.64k £0 £0