Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, HARTFORD, CHESTER DIOCESE
Charity number: 1134217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE SMITH | Chair | 31 October 2011 |
|
|||||||
Rev James Edward Henry Doo | Trustee | 17 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Maxwell Thomas Heumann | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
CHARLES ADAM LINDSAY HAYWARD | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Helen Jane Barber | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Jonathan Miller Teasdale | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Barry Chidlow | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Yevseyev | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Andre William Bulbeck | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Dim Alldridge | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|||||||
DR AUDREY EVELYN KERR-TAYLOR BDS | Trustee | 29 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
EMILY DEAN | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||
Dr JOHN GRAHAM CAMPBELL | Trustee | 30 March 2011 |
|
|
||||||
SIMON GREATREX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DANNY GREAVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ROSALIND IRENE CAMPBELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr DAVID RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.