Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, PONTELAND
Charity number: 1134771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND CAPTAIN PAUL TIMOTHY ALLINSON C A | Chair | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Donald Lloyd | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Dunscombe | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Hazel Caisley Farrell | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Hermione Matthew | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
June Atkinson BA | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Anne Louise Smith MA | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MARGARET JORDAN | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE ANTHONY JORDAN | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GRAHAM COMESKEY | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BUTLER | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|||||
MR Ted Henderson | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gwenneth Nicholson | Trustee | 24 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE RINGROSE | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|||||
JOHN RICHARD CAMPBELL DOHERTY | Trustee | 02 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr JANET LEILA WELSH MBBS MRCGP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN HENDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev Canon CHRISTINE LILIAN BROWN MA DipTheo | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DUNCAN WHEELER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.