Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER CHIPPENHAM

Charity number: 1131473
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Simon David Dunn Chair 22 February 2024
None on record
Rev Christina Lynne Godfrey Trustee 06 June 2024
None on record
Gillian Perkins Trustee 06 June 2024
None on record
Nigel Alfred Fuller BA Hons Trustee 04 April 2023
None on record
Elisabeth Mary Mildred Davies Trustee 30 June 2022
None on record
CHRISTOPHER GOUGH Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Matthew Charles Hurcum Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Susan Valerie Burt Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Ivan Hurcum Trustee 28 April 2014
None on record
VIVIENNE FULLER Trustee 22 July 2013
None on record
DAPHNE PATHENA BRINDLE Trustee 20 October 2011
None on record