Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN,ST AIDAN AND ST NATHANAEL WALTON-ON-THE-HILL LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1131787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Fiona Pennie Chair 29 March 2020
None on record
Anna Christine Banks Trustee 27 May 2021
None on record
Dorothy Parsons Trustee 27 May 2021
None on record
Leslie Hughes Trustee 27 May 2021
THE OPENING DOORS PROJECT
Received: On time
THE ORRELL PARK AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ORRELL PARK & DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Jacqueline Neville Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Gayle Connor-McCreith Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
BRENDA NETTLETON Trustee 21 April 2019
CHARITIES OF THOMAS BERRY AND OTHERS
Received: On time
WALTON-ON-THE-HILL NATIONAL
Overdue by 324 days
FRIENDS OF THE HISTORIC PARISH OF WALTON
Recently registered
WALTON COMMUNITY & ENTERPRISE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
ADA AND MAY DRINKALL PRIZES
Overdue by 689 days
Jayne Cunningham Trustee 28 May 2015
None on record
Rita Lacey Trustee 28 May 2014
CHARITIES OF THOMAS BERRY AND OTHERS
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE HISTORIC PARISH OF WALTON
Recently registered
George Liderth Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record
VALERIE JONES Trustee
None on record
DAVID ALAN CLAGUE Trustee
None on record
JEAN HYNES Trustee
None on record
DIANE ELIZABETH REGAN Trustee
None on record
JACQUELINE CADDEN Trustee
2ND WALTON ON THE HILL SCOUT GROUP
Overdue by 79 days
ADA AND MAY DRINKALL PRIZES
Overdue by 689 days
WALTON-ON-THE-HILL ENDOWED SCHOOL
Received: On time
JOAN STEIN Trustee
None on record
JEAN AUDREY OWENS Trustee
None on record
KEN MILLER Trustee
None on record
RUTH CAROL ROBINSON Trustee
None on record
WILLIAM FREDERICK JONES Trustee
None on record