BURNLEY AND PENDLE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities - Burnley area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

56 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 25 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 29 June 2018: Funds received from 1132530 THE METHODIST CHURCH PENDLE CIRCUIT
- BURNLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
56 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Perry | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Goldsbrough | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Cole | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Simpson | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Goldsbrough | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev james booth | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Christvin Edbarg | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Eccles | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Hargreaves | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Parker | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Graff | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Whittaker | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
claire slack | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
ian wheeler | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Ormrod | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Margaret Anne ridehalgh | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
maureen thornborrow | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
leanne Wright | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Barr | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Burrows | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lister | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Ruth Snell | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Donald Bradley | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Gildea | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia George | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Hardman | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neville Chadwick | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Hartley | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Smith | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY GODFREY | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
David James Hartley | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA COLE | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Landriau | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Trudy Thomas | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Elizabeth Whittaker | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Chadwick | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Alan Johnson | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Smith | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
kenneth reid | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hoyle | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Heather Johnson | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Yates | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Clark | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE WRENCH | Trustee | 30 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA ROSAMUNDE CATTERALL | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
DENISE WHEELER | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
LINDA ROGERS | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNE DIXON | Trustee | 23 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
WENDY CURSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
kath heyworth | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYN WALSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EILEEN TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM KEITH FORT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLIE BLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNNE DICKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Christine Barnes | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £325.29k | £337.43k | £331.80k | £293.93k | £481.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £405.02k | £342.11k | £290.02k | £331.99k | £370.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Pendle Fields
Fence
BURNLEY
Lancashire
BB12 9HN
- Phone:
- 01282613165
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window