THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' CHURCH, THORPE ACRE WITH DISHLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all and space for personal prayer and contemplation plus public events Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses, small groups,assemblies in schools The provision of a Youth Club, Elderly and Toddlers groups plus other groups Supporting other charities in UK and abroad
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 18 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- THORPE ACRE PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Stanton | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Jane Day | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lewis | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Timothy Robert Day | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANICE RIDDLE | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Fellows | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Annabel Charalambous BA Hons | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ellen Surtees | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Wood | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Green | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mandy May Pieniek Tilley | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Liquorish | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Barbara Stone | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill Green | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin John Barnett | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mo Shotter | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER GWYNNE BICKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN NORMAN WOOD MAAT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.24k | £87.03k | £106.52k | £97.50k | £116.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.32k | £97.58k | £90.45k | £97.11k | £111.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.30k | £4.15k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thorpe Acre Church
Thorpe Acre Road
Loughborough
LE11 4LF
- Phone:
- 01509236789
- Email:
- admin@astad.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window