Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, DAVYHULME

Charity number: 1132692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 March 2022 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 March 2022 142 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window