Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, DAVYHULME

Charity number: 1132692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Barbara Miller Trustee 02 May 2023
None on record
Karen Moira Iddon Trustee 02 May 2023
None on record
Joanne Elizabeth Hardy Trustee 02 May 2023
None on record
Elsie Vivienne Ward Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
Michelle Partington Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
Robert Wilson Brookes Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
Glyn Michael Chatterton Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Susan Ann McGrane Trustee 06 May 2020
None on record
Andrew David Spencer Trustee 27 March 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Anne Spencer Trustee 27 March 2019
None on record
Susan Margaret Wright Trustee 27 March 2019
None on record
Simon Richard Orr Trustee 27 March 2019
None on record
Dr William Edward Boxford Trustee 27 March 2019
None on record
Fiona Christine Jones Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
Yvonne Muriel Mackereth Trustee
MANCHESTER DIOCESAN CHURCH OF ENGLAND COUNCIL FOR SOCIAL AID
Received: On time
PETER RONALD WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record
Nicola Taylor Trustee
None on record
ANDREA CLARE SHEPHERD Trustee
None on record
DR SIMON ANDREW WRIGHT Trustee
None on record