THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN MEADS

Charity number: 1131574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £214.05k £316.31k £417.52k £283.55k £330.50k
Total expenditure £273.25k £272.58k £439.83k £396.94k £248.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £1.05k N/A £8.79k