THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN MEADS

Charity number: 1131574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr JOHN WILLIAM CAROE Trustee 19 April 2016
PRIME PARTNERSHIPS IN INTERNATIONAL MEDICAL EDUCATION Received: On time
EASTBOURNE CHURCHES VISITING Received: On time
Ian Christopher Chisholm Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
JORJ KOWSZUN Trustee None on record
Matthew Thorpe-Kuchta Trustee 13 October 2020 None on record
DEBORAH JANE CANNING BA Trustee None on record
DAVID MICHAEL SCOTT-RALPHS Trustee 04 April 2017 None on record
Diana Hilary Guthrie Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
Martyn Craig Delamere Trustee 13 October 2020 None on record
Rev Benjamin Luke Sleep Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
REV GILES MICHAEL GERARD CARPENTER Chair 23 June 2014 None on record
Ian Douglas Pinder Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
Maggie Gibson Trustee 20 April 2021 None on record
JILL ANNETTE PREECE Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
CATHERINE FIONA BUTCHER Trustee 08 January 2014 None on record
Janet Jackson Trustee 13 October 2020 None on record
SARAH CATHERINE HASSELL Trustee 01 June 2016 None on record
Clement Anthony Jackson Trustee 25 April 2019
THE HELMET (EASTBOURNE) TRUST Received: On time
EASTBOURNE CHRISTIAN RESOURCES Received: On time
Judith Marian Stone Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
Nicholas George Pendry Trustee 23 September 2017 None on record
MYRTLE MARTIN Trustee 13 October 2020
PERU PEOPLE Received: On time
Gillian Clare Howarth Trustee 13 October 2020 None on record
Sally Jane Scott-Ralphs Trustee 04 April 2017 None on record