WISBECH ST MARY PARENT, TEACHERS & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1132502
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 35 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 35 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 May 2018 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required