Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW'S WESTMINSTER
Charity number: 1132355

Charity reporting is up to date (91 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Preb Philip Anthony Edwin Chester | Chair |
|
||||||||
Muriel Adele Yvette Zagha-Shore | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Daniel William Bird | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|||||||
Jacintha Chawda | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev MICHAEL SKINNER | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Frances Jessica Streeting Mrs | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Alastair Callcutt | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
RAY MINGAY | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Lello | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Rachel Helen Jewitt | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
EITHNE RISNER | Trustee | 05 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Peter Louis Hanaway | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JONATHAN WILLIAM PATRICK AITKEN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
SUSAN MARY LOWSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JANE LOUISE KENNEDY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.