Trustees THE MANCHESTER GEOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 500532

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Margaret Hartley | Chair | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Dulieu | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rufus Brunt | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Daniels | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Kenneth Donovan | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth William Jacobs | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Relph | Trustee | 08 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr RAYMOND BURGESS | Trustee | 03 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA JANE FOWLER | Trustee | 25 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Sue Plumb | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER DEL STROTHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER FREDERICK GILES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.