THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PULBOROUGH

Charity number: 1132137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 May 2017 On time Download