THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PULBOROUGH

Charity number: 1132137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janet Mary Lees Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
MR ROB AYLOTT Trustee
BOAT BUILDING ACADEMY LIMITED Received: On time
Matthew Stuart Cargill Trustee 01 May 2018 None on record
Rev PAUL ROBERT SEAMAN Chair 17 September 2017
CHICHESTER DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR FAMILY SUPPORT WORK Received: On time
BRIAN ALBERT HUNTER Trustee None on record
Susan Margaret Scholefield Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
Mr Tony Holloway Trustee 01 May 2016 None on record
ALYSON HEATH Trustee 01 May 2016
THE LITTLE BOOKWORMS LIMITED Overdue by 152 days
CHICHESTER DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR FAMILY SUPPORT WORK Received: On time
EDUCATION WEST AFRICA Received: On time
CHURCH SCHOOLMASTERS AND SCHOOLMISTRESSES' BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION Received: On time
PETER WILLIAM GREGORY Trustee None on record
Arthur James Varndell Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Austen John Hindman Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
JAQUELINE WALBRIDGE Trustee None on record
Antoinette Kathleen Hayes Trustee 28 April 2019
THE HOSPITAL OF THE BLESSED MARY, COMMONLY CALLED ST MARY'S, HOSPITAL, CHICHESTER Received: On time
ANN MARIE KAISER Trustee 07 December 2011 None on record