Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, ISLINGTON

Charity number: 1131900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £577.20k £650.04k £438.01k £292.64k £726.27k
Total expenditure £625.91k £363.17k £797.40k £287.80k £432.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £157.49k £105.08k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £452.00k £528.13k N/A N/A £576.86k
Income - Other trading activities £3.95k £54.44k N/A N/A £77.39k
Income - Charitable activities £56.74k £8.87k N/A N/A £5.19k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £56.26k £52.34k N/A N/A £58.91k
Income - Other £8.25k £6.26k N/A N/A £7.91k
Income - Legacies £0 £17.00k N/A N/A £281.30k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £616.80k £360.59k N/A N/A £413.50k
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.85k £2.57k N/A N/A £18.70k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.90k N/A N/A £18.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £158.60k £161.42k N/A N/A £55.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A £18.27k
Expenditure - Other £4.26k £0 N/A N/A £0