Trustees MARRICK PRIORY TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1139240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROLLINE CHARLOTTE FREWEN Chair
TWO RIDINGS COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Clare Chapman Trustee 10 November 2022
None on record
Nicola Jane Dobson Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
Naomi Alejandra Hogan Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
Helen Margaret Stephenson Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Geoff Park Trustee 15 September 2020
None on record
Emma Cosgrif Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record
Judith Clarke Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record
Catherine Trewby Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record
BARRIE WHITFIELD Trustee
ROTARY CLUB OF WENSLEYDALE TRUST FUND
Received: On time