Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BEACONSFIELD

Charity number: 1132259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £654.66k £652.47k £635.20k £595.27k £293.77k
Total expenditure £667.58k £684.42k £674.94k £607.25k £309.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £5.77k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £81.99k £439.56k £427.10k £460.53k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £508.66k £127.07k £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £56.03k £64.79k £67.15k £61.97k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £7.98k £21.05k £4.83k £3.04k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £136.12k £69.73k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £10.50k £20.00k £56.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £593.61k £605.94k £611.07k £549.19k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £73.97k £78.48k £63.87k £58.06k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £5.46k £5.63k £6.14k £6.60k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £60.06k £51.54k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £27.88k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A