Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BEACONSFIELD

Charity number: 1132259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daphne Scott Trustee 15 May 2022
BEACONSFIELD CHURCH EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Richard Davidson Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Harriet Baldwin Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Annie Bennett Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Catherine Davidson Trustee 29 April 2021
None on record
Wendy Godrich Trustee 29 April 2021
None on record
Rev Sharon Roberts Trustee 18 October 2020
BEACONSFIELD CHURCH EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
CHEALE GIFT
Received: On time
Rev Michael Johnson Trustee 18 October 2020
BEACONSFIELD CHURCH EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
BETTER CONNECTED BEACONSFIELD
Received: On time
Rev Margot Mardelle Suter Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Derek Portwood Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Mary Rinehart Bischoff Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
WILLIAM EDWARDS Trustee 28 April 2019
BEACONSFIELD CHURCH EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
CHEALE GIFT
Received: On time
THE TYLERS GREEN VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Trevor Sharkey Trustee 30 April 2017
CLAIRES COURT PTA
Received: On time
Fiona Collins Trustee 30 April 2017
BEACONSFIELD CHURCH EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
ANDREW DAVID FARNCOMBE Trustee
BEACONSFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
BEACONSFIELD OLD CHURCH SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: On time
SAINT MARY AND ALL SAINTS BEACONSFIELD DEVELOPMENT FUND
Overdue by 93 days
Hazel May Chow Trustee
BEACONSFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Edward Weiss FCA Trustee
DIOCESAN TRUSTEES (OXFORD) LTD
Received: On time
SAINT MARY AND ALL SAINTS BEACONSFIELD DEVELOPMENT FUND
Overdue by 93 days