Accounts and annual returns WYLDE GREEN UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1136135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window