Financial history WYLDE GREEN UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1136135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £125.61k £127.82k £126.17k £121.08k £103.71k
Total expenditure £121.93k £124.47k £125.42k £151.83k £89.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £13.40k