Trustees WYLDE GREEN UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1136135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Samara Amber Knight Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Michael Alan Harris Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Joan Rawson Cox Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Andrew Harvyn Hughes Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Anthony John Hughes Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Jacqueline Anne Goring Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Jason James Gardner Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Patricia Mary Lister Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Heather Elizabeth Hall Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Edward Alan Richard Lyne Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Mark John Miles Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Philip Geoffrey Barker Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Kathryn Ann Willis Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Laura Anne Fowler Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Beverley Jane Lyne Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Susan Mary Jones Trustee 15 January 2017
None on record
Alastair Iain Frew Trustee 15 January 2017
None on record
Susan Eveline Miles Trustee 15 January 2017
None on record