Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STANFORD IN THE VALE WITH GOOSEY AND HATFORD
Charity number: 1132033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV PAUL ANTHONY EDDY | Chair | 15 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Elaine Sinclair | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Anne Howard-Jones | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Ann Gill | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvette Upton | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marion Galley | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gill | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL JOHN ARCHER | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Penman | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Clementina Mary Hardman | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARY WARREN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.