WIKIMEDIA UK

Charity number: 1144513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 19 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 19 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 04 December 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 04 December 2020 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 05 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 05 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 24 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 30 November 2017 On time Download