Financial history WIKIMEDIA UK

Charity number: 1144513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £700.40k £728.60k £734.67k £867.44k £860.25k
Total expenditure £688.74k £712.81k £724.37k £694.26k £832.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £695.93k £725.74k £732.55k £862.16k £669.94k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £179.35k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £52 £54 £312 £227 £222
Income - Other £4.42k £2.81k £1.81k £5.05k £10.75k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £610.21k £666.04k £672.29k £615.62k £716.50k
Expenditure - Raising funds £78.53k £46.77k £52.08k £78.65k £115.61k
Expenditure - Governance £47.33k £46.75k £45.03k £32.03k £37.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £5.50k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0