Trustees WIKIMEDIA UK
Charity number: 1144513

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIVIAN WINEMAN | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Adrian Beidas | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mark Cruickshank | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Julian Akodoye Manieson | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Caroline Ball | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Monisha Shah | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Kelly Foster | Trustee | 18 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Roderick Ward | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Harsangeet Kaur Bhullar | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jane Carlin | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Marnie Woodward | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.