THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ALBAN, NORTH HARROW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St. Alban's PCC has the responsibility of co-operating with the incumbent, the Revd. Dr Sarah Archer, in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It also has maintenance responsibilities for the whole complex of St Alban's, North Harrow.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Harrow
Governance
- 09 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. ALBAN'S PCC, NORTH HARROW (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sarah Elizabeth Archer | Chair | 18 August 2020 |
|
|||||||
Simon William GREGORY MSc | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
ADRIAN ALEXANDER PATRICK HOLLOWAY | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Pauline Schofield | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Irene Ann LAWRENCE BPhil | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Julian Richard ORTON | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Shalomi Jebitha JEBARATNAM M.Ed | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Roger Neil HOLBURD | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
David John MARTIN | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew GARNER Phd MA BA | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Noah Rajan KELLY | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ninus Khalil KHAKO DipHe | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Supritha KOTIAN | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Elizabeth Spencer-Davis | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Diane TUCK BSc | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Carys Margaret Grom | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Henry JOHNSON | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Julia Thamonda Michelle Skeete Powell | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
PAULINE MAY PRINCE | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £264.59k | £238.94k | £273.56k | £288.49k | £369.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £245.81k | £290.50k | £268.55k | £349.00k | £377.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.98k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PARISH OFFICE
St. Albans Church Hall
Norwood Drive
HARROW
HA2 7PF
- Phone:
- 0208 429 1383
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window