Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, ENFIELD

Charity number: 1133095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann Rolland Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
JAMES HORLICK Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Dave Cockle Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Charles Peter Lamb Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Rev James Lawson Trustee 30 May 2021
None on record
Aniru Shyllon Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Paul Reeve Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
David Bird Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Alison Ludlam Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
SALLY ELIZABETH ELPHICK Trustee 30 October 2020
None on record
Diane Coxon Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Pam Hagan Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Ken Cope Trustee 28 April 2019
TWELLS CHARITY
Received: On time
Anneliese Fenwick Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Michael Smith Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Rev MAUREEN LUNN Trustee 31 May 2011
None on record
ALISON JANET REEVE Trustee
None on record