THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, CHEADLE

Charity number: 1134783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tim Phillips Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
JOANNE LOUISE DAVIDS Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record
PHILIP GEORGE HENRY WELLS Trustee
Bible Encounter Trust Charitable Incorporated Organisation Received: On time
BIBLE ENCOUNTER TRUST Received: On time
DR Lindsey Ann Campbell Trustee 30 April 2014
ST. CUTHBERT'S OLD SCHOOL NURSERY Received: On time
FIONA SUSAN GOODE Trustee
THE CHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
JOHN LANCELOT BERRY Trustee None on record
REVD DR ROB MUNRO Chair
THE CHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
MARY REBECCA PEEL TRUST Received: On time
FELLOWSHIP OF WORD AND SPIRIT Received: On time
THE ALICE SMITH CHARITY Received: On time
ADA JANE BANCROFT Received: On time
THE UPPER ROOM, CHEADLE Received: On time
ANNIE SEDDON Received: On time
CHURCH SOCIETY Received: On time
RECTOR AND WARDENS CHEADLE PARISH CHURCH BELLRINGER TRUST Received: On time
Andrew Pugh Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
REV JAMES EDWIN MICHAEL NEWMAN Trustee
ST. CUTHBERT'S OLD SCHOOL NURSERY Received: On time
Paul Johnson Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
Lesley Gribbin Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
DAVID GRAHAM LOWCOCK Trustee
THE CHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
Bible Encounter Trust Charitable Incorporated Organisation Received: On time
BIBLE ENCOUNTER TRUST Received: On time
ANNIE SEDDON Received: On time
Winsome Richbell-Brown Trustee 25 April 2018
CAN-SURVIVE UK Received: On time
Stan Tomalin Trustee 19 September 2016 None on record
Trish Wells Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
Steve Mealand Trustee 20 April 2016
THE UPPER ROOM, CHEADLE Received: On time
ANNIE SEDDON Received: On time
Sarah Ruth Parikh Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
Ian Howard Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
DR Patricia Margaret Berry Trustee 30 April 2014 None on record
LAURA KATE READ Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
RUTH HEATHER ORMISTON Trustee 22 May 2012 None on record
JEREMY JAMES HARRIS Trustee None on record
ROBERT NAVESEY Trustee 21 May 2012 None on record