Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN WITH ST THOMAS, SHEPHERD'S BUSH
Charity number: 1133759
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Wood | Chair | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Sarah Faber | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Liliva Ayzatulina | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Ann Ellis | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Ann Talalla | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian James | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Seaborne | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Damien Lardoux | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Legge | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Cantor | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Olufemi Ladeinde | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Suzi Maskell | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Cheryl Suzanne Freeman | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Natalia Hermione Cassel | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA HERMIONE MARSHALL | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Denis Adide | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mauricio Karam | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Damian Pattinson | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIET MARY BYFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRY LEE CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.