Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CROSTHWAITE, SAINT KENTIGERN, KESWICK

Charity number: 1132320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £144.31k £150.40k £185.97k £188.15k £127.36k
Total expenditure £103.65k £119.90k £143.87k £158.70k £204.12k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A