VICTORY WORSHIP CENTRE

Charity number: 1131858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £156.93k £167.37k £222.19k £220.44k £185.75k
Total expenditure £153.93k £170.81k £211.80k £210.13k £171.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A