Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARGARET'S WARNHAM

Charity number: 1132082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 November 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 November 2019 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window