Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARGARET'S WARNHAM

Charity number: 1132082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Evans Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Hilary Farquhar Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
David Johnstone Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Steve Lambie Trustee 02 September 2020
THE WARNHAM CHURCH TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Alex Edgal Trustee 02 September 2020
None on record
Lucy Davenport Trustee 02 September 2020
None on record
Julia Smith Trustee 02 September 2020
None on record
Gareth Higgs Trustee 02 September 2020
None on record
ELAINE LAMBIE Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
MARTIN PAUL ROGERS Trustee 27 April 2013
None on record
Rosalind Grace Mary Parker Trustee 13 September 2011
THE WARNHAM CHURCH TRUST FUND
Received: On time
JONATHAN CHARLES LUCAS MA FRICS Trustee
THE WARNHAM CHURCH TRUST FUND
Received: On time
MARGARET ELIZABETH ORAM Trustee
None on record