Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW AND ST CUTHMAN STEYNING

Charity number: 1132913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Mark Duncan Grainger Heather Chair 28 April 2017
MRS FANNY INGRAM FOR THE CHURCH
Overdue by 177 days
THE FRIENDS OF STEYNING PARISH CHURCH
Received: On time
PENFOLD CHURCH HALL
Received: On time
Elizabeth Bronwen Trundle Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Stephen Adrian Holliday Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
William James Thomson Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Judith Susan THOMSON Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Sarah Lavery Trustee 18 October 2020
PENFOLD CHURCH HALL
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF STEYNING PARISH CHURCH
Received: On time
STEYNING DOWNLAND SCHEME
Received: On time
MRS FANNY INGRAM FOR THE CHURCH
Overdue by 177 days
Derek Edward Vine Trustee 14 June 2016
None on record
Penelope Anne Warner Trustee 27 April 2016
None on record
CHRISTINE NORMA AUBREY Trustee 22 April 2014
None on record
John Francis Edwards Trustee 22 April 2014
None on record
JOHN RALPH EBDON DOWNE Trustee
THE STEYNING SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF STEYNING PARISH CHURCH
Received: On time
LEONARD FRANCIS WARNER Trustee
None on record
Dr BRIAN HANSON CBE LLD Trustee
None on record