Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WILLINGDON

Charity number: 1133784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 December 2020 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 December 2020 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window