Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WILLINGDON

Charity number: 1133784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £231.65k £231.87k £167.17k £145.57k £128.19k
Total expenditure £162.43k £220.75k £182.84k £156.97k £159.68k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £3.19k £3.28k £7.45k N/A